Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Documents -see also- Maryland Register

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246
Title
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Environmental Impact Statements
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0267 /CH0207 (SB0179)
Title
Optional Retirement Program - Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0319 /CH0040 (SB0201)
Title
University of Maryland University College - Renaming
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0541
Title
Education – County Boards of Education – Disclosures and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0504
Title
Purchase of Motor Vehicles and Building Construction, Renovation, Rehabilitation, and Modification - Social Cost of Carbon Emissions
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0533 /CH0346 (SB0719/CH0345)
Title
University System of Maryland - Board of Regents - Transparency and Oversight
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0964
Title
Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian Consent
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0992
Title
Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184 (SB0191)
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1332 (SB0783)
Title
Public Health – Human Papillomavirus Vaccine – Information and Informed Consent (Christina’s Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026 /CH0266
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Expedited Document Processing
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0179 (HB0267/CH0207)
Title
Optional Retirement Program - Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0191 (HB1184)
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0201 (HB0319/CH0040)
Title
University of Maryland University College - Renaming
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0543 /CH0759
Title
Health – Vital Records – Health Information Exchange Data Access and Security Protocols and Protections
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0719 /CH0345 (HB0533/CH0346)
Title
University System of Maryland - Board of Regents - Transparency and Oversight
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0783 (HB1332)
Title
Public Health - Human Papillomavirus Vaccine - Information and Informed Consent
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0246 General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Environmental Impact Statements Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0267 /CH0207 (SB0179) Optional Retirement Program - Regulations Delegate Barnes, B. 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Appropriations
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
HB0319 /CH0040 (SB0201) University of Maryland University College - Renaming Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Appropriations
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0355 /CH0541 Education – County Boards of Education – Disclosures and Requirements Delegate Patterson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Ways and Means
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0504 Purchase of Motor Vehicles and Building Construction, Renovation, Rehabilitation, and Modification - Social Cost of Carbon Emissions Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0533 /CH0346 (SB0719/CH0345) University System of Maryland - Board of Regents - Transparency and Oversight Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Appropriations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0964 Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian Consent Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0992 Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1184 (SB0191) Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1332 (SB0783) Public Health – Human Papillomavirus Vaccine – Information and Informed Consent (Christina’s Law) Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0026 /CH0266 State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Expedited Document Processing Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0179 (HB0267/CH0207) Optional Retirement Program - Regulations Senator Griffith 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
1/31/2019 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0191 (HB1184) Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0201 (HB0319/CH0040) University of Maryland University College - Renaming Senator Pinsky 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0543 /CH0759 Health – Vital Records – Health Information Exchange Data Access and Security Protocols and Protections Senator Lam 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 759
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0719 /CH0345 (HB0533/CH0346) University System of Maryland - Board of Regents - Transparency and Oversight Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0783 (HB1332) Public Health - Human Papillomavirus Vaccine - Information and Informed Consent Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM