Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Hospitals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0809
Title
Firearms - Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository - Reporting, Qualifications for Possession, and Relief from Disqualification
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120
Title
Mental Hygiene Administration - Upper Shore Community Mental Health Center - Reopening and Maintenance
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258 (SB1040)
Title
Mental Hygiene - Reform of Laws and Delivery of Services
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1496
Title
Mental Hygiene Administration - Psychiatric Bed Registry - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0972
Title
Task Force to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1040 (HB1258)
Title
Mental Hygiene - Reform of Laws and Delivery of Services
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0809 Firearms - Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository - Reporting, Qualifications for Possession, and Relief from Disqualification Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/01/2013 - 12:00 PM
HB1120 Mental Hygiene Administration - Upper Shore Community Mental Health Center - Reopening and Maintenance Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1258 (SB1040) Mental Hygiene - Reform of Laws and Delivery of Services Delegate Hough 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1496 Mental Hygiene Administration - Psychiatric Bed Registry - Report Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0972 Task Force to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1040 (HB1258) Mental Hygiene - Reform of Laws and Delivery of Services Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM