Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Hospitals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0404 (SB0577/CH0305)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - State Facilities - Cemeteries
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0606 (SB0067)
Title
Mental Hygiene - Standards for Emergency Evaluation and Involuntary Admission - Modification
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0710 (SB0483/CH0510)
Title
Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety Program
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816 (SB0261)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144 (SB1097)
Title
Mental Hygiene Administration - Upper Shore Community Mental Health Center - Reopening and Maintenance
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1272
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0067 (HB0606)
Title
Mental Hygiene - Standards for Emergency Evaluation and Involuntary Admission - Modification
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0089 /CH0018
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Requirement for Certificate of Need - Exceptions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0261 (HB0816)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0483 /CH0510 (HB0710)
Title
Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety Program
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0577 /CH0305 (HB0404)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - State Facilities - Cemeteries
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1097 (HB1144)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0404 (SB0577/CH0305) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - State Facilities - Cemeteries Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0606 (SB0067) Mental Hygiene - Standards for Emergency Evaluation and Involuntary Admission - Modification Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0710 (SB0483/CH0510) Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety Program Delegate Cullison 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0816 (SB0261) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Delegate Hubbard 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1144 (SB1097) Mental Hygiene Administration - Upper Shore Community Mental Health Center - Reopening and Maintenance Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1272 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes Delegate Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0067 (HB0606) Mental Hygiene - Standards for Emergency Evaluation and Involuntary Admission - Modification Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0089 /CH0018 Maryland Health Care Commission - Requirement for Certificate of Need - Exceptions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0261 (HB0816) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0483 /CH0510 (HB0710) Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety Program Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0577 /CH0305 (HB0404) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - State Facilities - Cemeteries Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1097 (HB1144) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM