Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Hospitals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028
Title
Commission on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0437 /CH0147 (SB0537)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0441
Title
Public Health - Assisted Outpatient Treatment and Mobile Crisis Teams
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1121 (SB0012)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Closures or Partial Closures of Hospitals - County Board of Health Approval
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1561 (SB1081/CH0241)
Title
Mental Health - Voluntary and Involuntary Admissions - Certification by Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0012 (HB1121)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Closures or Partial Closures of Hospitals - County Board of Health Approval
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0413 (HB1499)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Prevention Resolution Services - Funding and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0473 /CH0211 (HB0582)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Clifton T. Perkins Maximum Security Guards - Allowances
Sponsor
Senator Peters
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0537 (HB0437/CH0147)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0586 /CH0685 (HB1509)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Regional Institutes for Children and Adolescents - Report Before Closure
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1081 /CH0241 (HB1561)
Title
Mental Health - Voluntary and Involuntary Admissions - Certification by Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0028 Commission on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0437 /CH0147 (SB0537) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0441 Public Health - Assisted Outpatient Treatment and Mobile Crisis Teams Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1121 (SB0012) Health Care Facilities - Closures or Partial Closures of Hospitals - County Board of Health Approval Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1561 (SB1081/CH0241) Mental Health - Voluntary and Involuntary Admissions - Certification by Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (140-1)
Health and Government Operations
4/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0012 (HB1121) Health Care Facilities - Closures or Partial Closures of Hospitals - County Board of Health Approval Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0413 (HB1499) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Prevention Resolution Services - Funding and Reporting Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0473 /CH0211 (HB0582) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Clifton T. Perkins Maximum Security Guards - Allowances Senator Peters 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2016 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0537 (HB0437/CH0147) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0586 /CH0685 (HB1509) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Regional Institutes for Children and Adolescents - Report Before Closure Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 685
Finance
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1081 /CH0241 (HB1561) Mental Health - Voluntary and Involuntary Admissions - Certification by Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Finance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM