Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Hospitals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0984 (SB0475)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1233 (SB0984)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Enhanced Security Compassionate Release Program
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0475 (HB0984)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0772
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Employees - Job Titles, Position Descriptions, and Compensation Levels
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0984 (HB1233)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Enhanced Security Compassionate Release Program
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0984 (SB0475) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
Appropriations
HB1233 (SB0984) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Enhanced Security Compassionate Release Program Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0475 (HB0984) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Crisis Prevention Services - Funding and Reporting Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0772 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Employees - Job Titles, Position Descriptions, and Compensation Levels Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0984 (HB1233) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Enhanced Security Compassionate Release Program Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM