Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Hospitals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0033 /CH0760
Title
Guardianship of Disabled Persons - Voluntary Admission to Mental Facility
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0111 /CH0188 (SB0233/CH0189)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Defendants Found Incompetent to Stand Trial or Not Criminally Responsible - Commitment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1392 (SB0864/CH0682)
Title
Health – Emergency Evaluees and Involuntarily Admitted or Committed Individuals – Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1635 /CH0729 (SB0947/CH0730)
Title
Mental Health Law - Involuntary Admissions - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0233 /CH0189 (HB0111/CH0188)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Defendants Found Incompetent to Stand Trial or Not Criminally Responsible - Commitment
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0361 /CH0703 (HB0202/CH0702)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility – Court–Ordered Evaluation
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0947 /CH0730 (HB1635/CH0729)
Title
Mental Health Law - Involuntary Admissions - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0033 /CH0760 Guardianship of Disabled Persons - Voluntary Admission to Mental Facility Delegate Lam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 760
Health and Government Operations
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0111 /CH0188 (SB0233/CH0189) Maryland Department of Health - Defendants Found Incompetent to Stand Trial or Not Criminally Responsible - Commitment Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Judiciary
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1392 (SB0864/CH0682) Health – Emergency Evaluees and Involuntarily Admitted or Committed Individuals – Procedures Delegate Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1635 /CH0729 (SB0947/CH0730) Mental Health Law - Involuntary Admissions - Procedures Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0233 /CH0189 (HB0111/CH0188) Maryland Department of Health - Defendants Found Incompetent to Stand Trial or Not Criminally Responsible - Commitment Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0361 /CH0703 (HB0202/CH0702) Criminal Procedure – Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility – Court–Ordered Evaluation Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 703
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0947 /CH0730 (HB1635/CH0729) Mental Health Law - Involuntary Admissions - Procedures Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 730
Finance
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:56 PM