Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Hospitals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306 (SB0402)
Title
Mental Health - Involuntary Admission - Inmates in Correctional Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 /CH0692 (SB0759)
Title
Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0941 (SB0976)
Title
Public Behavioral Health System - Implementation Plans to Improve Efficiency, Accountability, and Outcomes - Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1006
Title
State Mental Health Facilities - Staffing Committee and Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1240 (SB0730)
Title
State Personnel – Merit Pay
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1420 /CH0390
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Services for Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Fee-for-Service Payment Pilot Program
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0402 (HB0306)
Title
Mental Health - Involuntary Admission - Inmates in Correctional Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0730 (HB1240)
Title
State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0976 (HB0941)
Title
Public Behavioral Health System - Implementation Plans to Improve Efficiency, Accountability, and Outcomes - Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0306 (SB0402) Mental Health - Involuntary Admission - Inmates in Correctional Facilities Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0768 /CH0692 (SB0759) Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 692
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0941 (SB0976) Public Behavioral Health System - Implementation Plans to Improve Efficiency, Accountability, and Outcomes - Workgroup Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1006 State Mental Health Facilities - Staffing Committee and Plan Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1240 (SB0730) State Personnel – Merit Pay Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1420 /CH0390 Maryland Department of Health - Services for Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Fee-for-Service Payment Pilot Program Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0402 (HB0306) Mental Health - Involuntary Admission - Inmates in Correctional Facilities Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0730 (HB1240) State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0976 (HB0941) Public Behavioral Health System - Implementation Plans to Improve Efficiency, Accountability, and Outcomes - Workgroup Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM