Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State House

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0679 /CH0222 (SB0872)
Title
Workplace Harassment – Prohibitions, Liability, Enforcement, and Prevention Training
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0995
Title
State Government - President Barack Obama Statue - Placement and Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0999
Title
State House Trust - Lawyer's Mall - Maintenance
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872 (HB0679/CH0222)
Title
Workplace Harassment - Prohibitions, Liability, and Enforcement
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0679 /CH0222 (SB0872) Workplace Harassment – Prohibitions, Liability, Enforcement, and Prevention Training Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Appropriations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
HB0995 State Government - President Barack Obama Statue - Placement and Commission Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0999 State House Trust - Lawyer's Mall - Maintenance Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0872 (HB0679/CH0222) Workplace Harassment - Prohibitions, Liability, and Enforcement President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM