Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Prosecutor

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0358 (SB0270)
Title
Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0364 /CH0224 (SB0224)
Title
State Prosecutor and Deputy State Prosecutor - Witness Immunity - Compulsory Testimony
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942
Title
State Government - Use of Public Resources - Reimbursement by Elected State Officials
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1245 (SB0922/CH0205)
Title
Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0224 (HB0364/CH0224)
Title
State Prosecutor and Deputy State Prosecutor - Witness Immunity - Compulsory Testimony
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0269 /CH0050
Title
Local Government - Municipal Elections - Voting Offenses, Penalties, and Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 (HB0358)
Title
Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0922 /CH0205 (HB1245)
Title
Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic Notification
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0358 (SB0270) Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0364 /CH0224 (SB0224) State Prosecutor and Deputy State Prosecutor - Witness Immunity - Compulsory Testimony Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Judiciary
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0942 State Government - Use of Public Resources - Reimbursement by Elected State Officials Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1245 (SB0922/CH0205) Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic Notification Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0224 (HB0364/CH0224) State Prosecutor and Deputy State Prosecutor - Witness Immunity - Compulsory Testimony Senator Raskin 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0269 /CH0050 Local Government - Municipal Elections - Voting Offenses, Penalties, and Enforcement Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0270 (HB0358) Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0922 /CH0205 (HB1245) Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic Notification Senator Stone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM