Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Police, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0013
Title
Regulated Firearms - Licensed Dealer or Secondary Seller - National Instant Criminal Background (NICS) Check
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0021
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Qualification License - Qualified Handgun Instructors and Permit Holders
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0039 (SB0736/CH0379)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0189 /CH0404 (SB0261)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Background Investigation - Armored Car Company Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306
Title
Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0382 /CH0244
Title
Sexual Assault Survivors' Right to Know Act
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0432
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Applicant Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0477 (SB0326)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Term
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0767 (SB0100)
Title
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0954 /CH0134
Title
Public Safety - Deaths Involving a Law Enforcement Officer - Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1057
Title
Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1110 /CH0298
Title
Law Enforcement - Special Police Officers
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086 /CH0323
Title
Public Safety - Hit and Run Suspects - Yellow Alert Program
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0100 (HB0767)
Title
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0261 (HB0189/CH0404)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Background Investigation - Armored Car Company Employees
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0326 (HB0477)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Term
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0370 /CH0164
Title
Unmanned Aircraft Systems Research, Development, Regulation, and Privacy Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0407
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permits
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0618 /CH0184
Title
Public Safety - Retired Law Enforcement Officer Identification Card
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Public Safety - State Police - Statewide Database on Police Brutality
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0736 /CH0379 (HB0039)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0781
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Temporary Training Waiver
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0013 Regulated Firearms - Licensed Dealer or Secondary Seller - National Instant Criminal Background (NICS) Check Delegate Schulz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0021 Public Safety - Handgun Qualification License - Qualified Handgun Instructors and Permit Holders Delegate Schulz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0039 (SB0736/CH0379) Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - Repeal Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0189 /CH0404 (SB0261) Public Safety - Handgun Permit Background Investigation - Armored Car Company Employees Delegate Cluster 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0306 Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015 Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0382 /CH0244 Sexual Assault Survivors' Right to Know Act Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0432 Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Applicant Qualifications Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0477 (SB0326) Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Term Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0767 (SB0100) Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0954 /CH0134 Public Safety - Deaths Involving a Law Enforcement Officer - Reports Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1057 Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - Prohibition Delegate Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1110 /CH0298 Law Enforcement - Special Police Officers Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0086 /CH0323 Public Safety - Hit and Run Suspects - Yellow Alert Program Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0100 (HB0767) Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0261 (HB0189/CH0404) Public Safety - Handgun Permit Background Investigation - Armored Car Company Employees Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0326 (HB0477) Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Term Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0370 /CH0164 Unmanned Aircraft Systems Research, Development, Regulation, and Privacy Act of 2015 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0407 Public Safety - Handgun Permits Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0618 /CH0184 Public Safety - Retired Law Enforcement Officer Identification Card Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0692 Public Safety - State Police - Statewide Database on Police Brutality Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0736 /CH0379 (HB0039) Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - Repeal Senator Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0781 Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Temporary Training Waiver Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM