Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

State Symbols

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0096 (SB0029)
Title
State Designations - State Sandwich - Soft-Shell Crab Sandwich
Sponsor
Delegate Cane
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0270 /CH0094
Title
General Provisions Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 /CH0104
Title
General Provisions - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0029 (HB0096)
Title
State Designations - State Sandwich - Soft-Shell Crab Sandwich
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0096 (SB0029) State Designations - State Sandwich - Soft-Shell Crab Sandwich Delegate Cane 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0270 /CH0094 General Provisions Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0969 /CH0104 General Provisions - Cross-References and Corrections Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0029 (HB0096) State Designations - State Sandwich - Soft-Shell Crab Sandwich Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM
Click to return on the top page