Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Symbols

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0215 (SB0049)
Title
Maryland State Song - Revision
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0303 (SB0026)
Title
State Designations - State Tartan
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0417
Title
State Song - Replacement - State Song Selection Panel and Competition
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1037
Title
State Designations - State Waterfowl - Canvasback Duck
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026 (HB0303)
Title
State Designations - State Tartan
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0027
Title
State Designations - State Duck - Canvasback
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0039
Title
General Provisions - State Designations - Great Seal
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0049 (HB0215)
Title
Maryland State Song - Revision
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0222
Title
Maryland State Song - Repeal and Replace - State Song Selection Panel
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0215 (SB0049) Maryland State Song - Revision Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0303 (SB0026) State Designations - State Tartan Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0417 State Song - Replacement - State Song Selection Panel and Competition Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB1037 State Designations - State Waterfowl - Canvasback Duck Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0026 (HB0303) State Designations - State Tartan Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0027 State Designations - State Duck - Canvasback Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0039 General Provisions - State Designations - Great Seal Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0049 (HB0215) Maryland State Song - Revision Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0222 Maryland State Song - Repeal and Replace - State Song Selection Panel Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM