Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State's Attorneys

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0174 (SB0375)
Title
Election Law - Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0461
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618
Title
Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Traveling Elephant Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0770
Title
Courts - Appointments to Vacant Offices by the Judiciary - Same Party as Predecessor
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1029 /CH0146
Title
Criminal Law – Wearing, Carrying, or Transporting Loaded Handgun – Subsequent Offender
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1057
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Denial of Petition Without Hearing
Sponsor
Delegate Sanchez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1082 (SB0593)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1169 (SB0343)
Title
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267 (SB0869)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1330
Title
Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest - Political Consulting
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1494 (SB0964)
Title
Social Services – Safe Harbor Child Trafficking Victim Service Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1646 /CH0251 (SB1036)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1811
Title
Education - Threat Assessment Teams - Establishment and Oversight
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0343 (HB1169)
Title
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0375 (HB0174)
Title
Election Law - Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581
Title
Victims and Witnesses – U Nonimmigrant Status – Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0748 (HB0791)
Title
Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869 (HB1267)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0964 (HB1494)
Title
Social Services - Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Workgroup Revisions and Reports
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1036 (HB1646/CH0251)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1263
Title
Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation)
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1268
Title
Criminal Procedure - Lifetime Sexual Offender Supervision - Violations and Petitions for Discharge
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0174 (SB0375) Election Law - Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0461 Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness Delegate Morales 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-3)
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0618 Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Traveling Elephant Acts Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0770 Courts - Appointments to Vacant Offices by the Judiciary - Same Party as Predecessor Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0887 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1029 /CH0146 Criminal Law – Wearing, Carrying, or Transporting Loaded Handgun – Subsequent Offender Delegate Branch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1057 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Denial of Petition Without Hearing Delegate Sanchez 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1082 (SB0593) Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB1169 (SB0343) Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1267 (SB0869) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1330 Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest - Political Consulting Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1494 (SB0964) Social Services – Safe Harbor Child Trafficking Victim Service Pilot Program Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1646 /CH0251 (SB1036) Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1811 Education - Threat Assessment Teams - Establishment and Oversight Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0343 (HB1169) Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0375 (HB0174) Election Law - Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0581 Victims and Witnesses – U Nonimmigrant Status – Certification of Victim Helpfulness Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0748 (HB0791) Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions Senator Astle 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0816 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0869 (HB1267) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0964 (HB1494) Social Services - Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Workgroup Revisions and Reports Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1036 (HB1646/CH0251) Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1263 Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation) Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1268 Criminal Procedure - Lifetime Sexual Offender Supervision - Violations and Petitions for Discharge Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:56 PM