Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Statutes of Limitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0001 /CH0004 (SB0002/CH0003)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008 (SB0413)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit - Testing Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0077 /CH0346 (SB0258/CH0347)
Title
Condominiums - Claims Against Developers and Vendors - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0474 /CH0260 (SB1014/CH0261)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Breach of Trust Action - Limitation Period
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0635 (SB0837)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0891 (SB0838)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Coram Nobis - Time for Filing
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1276 (SB0881)
Title
Criminal Law – Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 /CH0003 (HB0001/CH0004)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0042 /CH0549
Title
Courts - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258 /CH0347 (HB0077/CH0346)
Title
Condominiums – Claims Against Developers and Vendors – Unenforceability of Certain Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0413 (HB0008)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit - Testing Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0426
Title
Election Laws - Loans to a Campaign Finance Entity
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837 (HB0635)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0838 (HB0891)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Coram Nobis - Time for Filing
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 (HB1276)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1014 /CH0261 (HB0474/CH0260)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Breach of Trust Action - Limitation Period
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0001 /CH0004 (SB0002/CH0003) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Judiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0008 (SB0413) Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit - Testing Requirement Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0077 /CH0346 (SB0258/CH0347) Condominiums - Claims Against Developers and Vendors - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Environment and Transportation
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0474 /CH0260 (SB1014/CH0261) Estates and Trusts - Breach of Trust Action - Limitation Period Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0635 (SB0837) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Contracts Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Economic Matters
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0887 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0891 (SB0838) Criminal Procedure - Coram Nobis - Time for Filing Delegate Moon 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1276 (SB0881) Criminal Law – Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0002 /CH0003 (HB0001/CH0004) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Judicial Proceedings
1/11/2018 - 1:15 PM
Judiciary
SB0042 /CH0549 Courts - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Statute of Limitations Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0258 /CH0347 (HB0077/CH0346) Condominiums – Claims Against Developers and Vendors – Unenforceability of Certain Provisions Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0413 (HB0008) Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit - Testing Requirement Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0426 Election Laws - Loans to a Campaign Finance Entity Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0816 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0837 (HB0635) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Contracts Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0838 (HB0891) Criminal Procedure - Coram Nobis - Time for Filing Senator Smith 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0881 (HB1276) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1014 /CH0261 (HB0474/CH0260) Estates and Trusts - Breach of Trust Action - Limitation Period Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:56 PM