Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Statutes of Limitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0278 (SB0200)
Title
Criminal Law - Misconduct in Office
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0627
Title
Courts - Prosecution for Election Law Violations - Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations (Hidden Predator Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1562
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0200 (HB0278)
Title
Criminal Law - Misconduct in Office
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0296
Title
Family Law – Preventing or Interfering With Report of Suspected Sexual Abuse of a Child – Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Claims for Refund
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0278 (SB0200) Criminal Law - Misconduct in Office Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0627 Courts - Prosecution for Election Law Violations - Limitation Delegate Jackson, M. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Ways and Means
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judicial Proceedings
HB0974 Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations (Hidden Predator Act of 2020) Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (127-0)
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1562 Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0200 (HB0278) Criminal Law - Misconduct in Office President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0296 Family Law – Preventing or Interfering With Report of Suspected Sexual Abuse of a Child – Statute of Limitations Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0941 Motor Fuel Tax - Claims for Refund Senator Hayes 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:32 PM