Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

St. Mary's County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0007 /CH0346
Title
Southern Maryland Higher Education Council - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Bohanan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0216 /CH0358 (SB0035)
Title
Queen Anne's County and St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0257 /CH0094
Title
St. Mary's County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership Requirements
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0285
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery License
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0288 /CH0096
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0301 /CH0364
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 6 Pub-Brewery License
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0423
Title
St. Mary's County - Building Impact Fees
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0520
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Officials - Salaries
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0555 /CH0378
Title
St. Mary's County - Building Impact Fees - Deferrals
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0831 /CH0564 (SB0828/CH0563)
Title
St. Mary's College of Maryland - Tuition Freeze and DeSousa-Brent Scholars Completion Grant
Sponsor
Delegate Bohanan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0863 (SB0841/CH0428)
Title
Higher Education Fair Share Act
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0992
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - St. Mary's County - Pathway's Facility Renovation
Sponsor
Delegate Bohanan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1019 /CH0293 (SB0586/CH0292)
Title
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland Region
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1507 /CH0690
Title
St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0035 (HB0216/CH0358)
Title
Queen Anne's County and St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0586 /CH0292 (HB1019/CH0293)
Title
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland Region
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789
Title
Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0828 /CH0563 (HB0831/CH0564)
Title
St. Mary's College of Maryland - Tuition Freeze and DeSousa-Brent Scholars Completion Grant
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0841 /CH0428 (HB0863)
Title
Higher Education Fair Share Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0920 /CH0333
Title
Natural Resources - Submerged Land and Water Column Leases - Herring Creek
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0007 /CH0346 Southern Maryland Higher Education Council - Modifications Delegate Bohanan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Appropriations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0216 /CH0358 (SB0035) Queen Anne's County and St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0257 /CH0094 St. Mary's County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership Requirements St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Judiciary
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0285 St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery License St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0288 /CH0096 St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Appropriations
2/05/2013 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0301 /CH0364 St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 6 Pub-Brewery License St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0423 St. Mary's County - Building Impact Fees St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0520 St. Mary's County - Public Officials - Salaries St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0555 /CH0378 St. Mary's County - Building Impact Fees - Deferrals St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0831 /CH0564 (SB0828/CH0563) St. Mary's College of Maryland - Tuition Freeze and DeSousa-Brent Scholars Completion Grant Delegate Bohanan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0863 (SB0841/CH0428) Higher Education Fair Share Act Speaker 3 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0992 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - St. Mary's County - Pathway's Facility Renovation Delegate Bohanan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1019 /CH0293 (SB0586/CH0292) Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland Region Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Environmental Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1507 /CH0690 St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 690
Environmental Matters
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0035 (HB0216/CH0358) Queen Anne's County and St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0586 /CH0292 (HB1019/CH0293) Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland Region Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0789 Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0828 /CH0563 (HB0831/CH0564) St. Mary's College of Maryland - Tuition Freeze and DeSousa-Brent Scholars Completion Grant Senator Madaleno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0841 /CH0428 (HB0863) Higher Education Fair Share Act President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Finance
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0920 /CH0333 Natural Resources - Submerged Land and Water Column Leases - Herring Creek Senator Dyson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM