Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

St. Mary's County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0105 /CH0106
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Beer License Fee
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107 /CH0107
Title
St. Mary's County - Leonardtown - Disposition of Alcoholic Beverages Licenses Fees
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0110 /CH0741
Title
St. Mary's County - Inmate Release Programs
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136
Title
St. Mary's County - Board of Library Trustees
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 /CH0108
Title
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0331 /CH0109
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1485 /CH0531
Title
Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf Owners
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0451
Title
Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - St. Mary's Nursing Center
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0105 /CH0106 St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Beer License Fee St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0107 /CH0107 St. Mary's County - Leonardtown - Disposition of Alcoholic Beverages Licenses Fees St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0110 /CH0741 St. Mary's County - Inmate Release Programs St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 741
Judiciary
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0136 St. Mary's County - Board of Library Trustees St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/01/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0275 /CH0108 St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0331 /CH0109 St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1485 /CH0531 Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf Owners Delegate Fisher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0451 Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - St. Mary's Nursing Center Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:56 PM