Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

St. Mary's County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525
Title
St. Mary’s County – Law Enforcement Hearing Board – Civilian Members
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0526 (SB0239)
Title
St. Mary’s County – Public and Nonpublic Schools – Prohibition on Possession of Tobacco Products by Minors
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0527
Title
St. Mary’s County Human Relations Commission – Equal Treatment
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528
Title
St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0529
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Distillery On-Site Consumption Permit
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0530
Title
St. Mary's County - Gaming - Administration of Bingo Licenses
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Deer Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones - Prince George's County PG 402-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0639 (SB0051)
Title
Tri–County Council for Southern Maryland – Property Management – Southern Maryland Regional Agricultural Center
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0655
Title
Local Elections - County Commissioner and County Boards of Education - District Voting
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0813 (SB0861)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0814
Title
St. Mary’s County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Annual Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0862
Title
St. Mary’s County and Metropolitan Commission – Debt Limitations
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0863
Title
St. Mary’s County – Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Golf Carts
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1081 (SB0751)
Title
Southern Maryland – Human Relations Commission
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Officials - Salaries
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1374
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0051 (HB0639)
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Property Management - Southern Maryland Regional Agricultural Center
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239 (HB0526)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Prohibition on Possession of Tobacco Products by Minors
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0680 (HB0929)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Administration of Benefits - Clarification
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0751 (HB1081)
Title
Southern Maryland - Human Relations Commission
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB0813)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0525 St. Mary’s County – Law Enforcement Hearing Board – Civilian Members Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0526 (SB0239) St. Mary’s County – Public and Nonpublic Schools – Prohibition on Possession of Tobacco Products by Minors St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0527 St. Mary’s County Human Relations Commission – Equal Treatment St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/06/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0528 St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0529 St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Distillery On-Site Consumption Permit St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0530 St. Mary's County - Gaming - Administration of Bingo Licenses St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0615 Natural Resources - Sunday Deer Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones - Prince George's County PG 402-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0639 (SB0051) Tri–County Council for Southern Maryland – Property Management – Southern Maryland Regional Agricultural Center Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0655 Local Elections - County Commissioner and County Boards of Education - District Voting Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0813 (SB0861) St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0814 St. Mary’s County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Annual Fees Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0862 St. Mary’s County and Metropolitan Commission – Debt Limitations St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0863 St. Mary’s County – Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Golf Carts St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1081 (SB0751) Southern Maryland – Human Relations Commission Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1097 St. Mary's County - Local Officials - Salaries St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/06/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1374 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0051 (HB0639) Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Property Management - Southern Maryland Regional Agricultural Center Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0239 (HB0526) St. Mary's County - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Prohibition on Possession of Tobacco Products by Minors Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2021 - 3:00 PM
SB0680 (HB0929) State Retirement and Pension System - Administration of Benefits - Clarification Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2021 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0751 (HB1081) Southern Maryland - Human Relations Commission Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2021 - 1:15 PM
SB0861 (HB0813) St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 5:22 PM
Click to return on the top page