Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Storage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0269 /CH0637 (SB0531/CH0638)
Title
Housing Navigator and Aftercare Program
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0296
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Warehouse Shopping Clubs - Beer or Wine Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0316 (SB0428)
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Dispensing of Drugs Containing Controlled Dangerous Substances - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490 (SB0758/CH0389)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0582
Title
Pharmacies - Availability of Generically Equivalent Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0693 (SB0642)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Investigations and Subpoenas - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0771 /CH0216 (SB0262/CH0215)
Title
Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by County Health Departments
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0773 /CH0382 (SB0715)
Title
Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0824 /CH0823 (SB0548/CH0824)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876 (SB0918)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1395
Title
Solar Energy Grant Program - Energy Storage
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0262 /CH0215 (HB0771/CH0216)
Title
Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by County Health Departments
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0428 (HB0316)
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Dispensing of Drugs Containing Controlled Dangerous Substances - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0642 (HB0693)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Investigations and Subpoenas - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 /CH0389 (HB0490)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0918 (HB0876)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0965
Title
Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency Administration
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0269 /CH0637 (SB0531/CH0638) Housing Navigator and Aftercare Program Delegate Krimm 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 637
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0296 Alcoholic Beverages - Warehouse Shopping Clubs - Beer or Wine Licenses Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0316 (SB0428) State Board of Pharmacy - Dispensing of Drugs Containing Controlled Dangerous Substances - Requirements Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0490 (SB0758/CH0389) Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0582 Pharmacies - Availability of Generically Equivalent Drugs Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0693 (SB0642) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Investigations and Subpoenas - Revisions Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0771 /CH0216 (SB0262/CH0215) Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by County Health Departments Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0773 /CH0382 (SB0715) Clean Energy - Energy Storage Technology Study Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Economic Matters
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0824 /CH0823 (SB0548/CH0824) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 823
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0876 (SB0918) Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1395 Solar Energy Grant Program - Energy Storage Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0262 /CH0215 (HB0771/CH0216) Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by County Health Departments Senator Bates 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0428 (HB0316) State Board of Pharmacy - Dispensing of Drugs Containing Controlled Dangerous Substances - Requirements Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0642 (HB0693) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Investigations and Subpoenas - Revisions Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0758 /CH0389 (HB0490) Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2017 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0918 (HB0876) Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0965 Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency Administration Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM