Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Storage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0051 (SB0106)
Title
Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Target Redevelopment Area - Washington County
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0109 /CH0579 (SB0285/CH0580)
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0468 (SB0441)
Title
Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0503 (SB0219)
Title
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0717
Title
Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0774 (SB0622/CH0335)
Title
Governor’s Office of Crime Control and Prevention – Crime Firearms – Study
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0904 (SB0546/CH0760)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0943
Title
Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1010 /CH0317 (SB0801/CH0318)
Title
Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1380
Title
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities - Late Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0106 (HB0051)
Title
Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Target Redevelopment Area - Washington County
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0219 (HB0503)
Title
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0283 /CH0293
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Cleaning of Commercial or Industrial Buildings - Community Property Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0285 /CH0580 (HB0109/CH0579)
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0441 (HB0468)
Title
Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531
Title
Public Health - Overdose Response - Storage Warehouses
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546 /CH0760 (HB0904)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801 /CH0318 (HB1010/CH0317)
Title
Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0051 (SB0106) Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Target Redevelopment Area - Washington County Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0109 /CH0579 (SB0285/CH0580) Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0468 (SB0441) Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
HB0503 (SB0219) Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity Delegate Cassilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0717 Law Enforcement Body Camera Task Force Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0774 (SB0622/CH0335) Governor’s Office of Crime Control and Prevention – Crime Firearms – Study Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0904 (SB0546/CH0760) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0943 Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1010 /CH0317 (SB0801/CH0318) Brewery Modernization Act of 2019 Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Economic Matters
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1380 Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities - Late Fees Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0106 (HB0051) Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Target Redevelopment Area - Washington County Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0219 (HB0503) Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0283 /CH0293 Sales and Use Tax - Cleaning of Commercial or Industrial Buildings - Community Property Exemption Senator Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0285 /CH0580 (HB0109/CH0579) Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Economic Matters
SB0441 (HB0468) Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0531 Public Health - Overdose Response - Storage Warehouses Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0546 /CH0760 (HB0904) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 760
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0801 /CH0318 (HB1010/CH0317) Brewery Modernization Act of 2019 Senator Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM