Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Street Lights

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177
Title
Street Lighting - Purchase of Equipment by Local Government and Tariffs
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1295
Title
Procurement - State Funds - Energy Efficient Outdoor Lighting Fixtures
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1373
Title
Public Utility Property - Operating Personal Property - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1483
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Montgomery County - Quebec Terrace Lighting
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1177 Street Lighting - Purchase of Equipment by Local Government and Tariffs Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1295 Procurement - State Funds - Energy Efficient Outdoor Lighting Fixtures Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1373 Public Utility Property - Operating Personal Property - Definition Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1483 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Montgomery County - Quebec Terrace Lighting Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM