Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Strikes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0257 (SB0293/CH0288)
Title
Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490 (SB0749)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0917
Title
Maryland Aviation Administration - Contract Authority - Transportation Companies
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292 (SB0824)
Title
District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0293 /CH0288 (HB0257)
Title
Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0749 (HB0490)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0824 (HB1292)
Title
District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0257 (SB0293/CH0288) Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0490 (SB0749) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0917 Maryland Aviation Administration - Contract Authority - Transportation Companies Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1292 (SB0824) District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining Delegate Jones 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0293 /CH0288 (HB0257) Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Finance
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0749 (HB0490) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0824 (HB1292) District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM
Click to return on the top page