Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Subpoenas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0573 (SB0518)
Title
Fair Elections Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0892 (SB0329)
Title
Baltimore County - Civil Actions - Subpoena for Police Officer - Liability of Party for Reimbursement of Cost
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0985
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993 (SB0752)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1019 (SB0532)
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022 (SB0609)
Title
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1101
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Program Integrity and Recovery Activities
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1145 (SB0903)
Title
State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0252
Title
Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0329 (HB0892)
Title
Baltimore County - Civil Actions - Subpoena for Police Officer - Liability of Party for Reimbursement of Cost
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0518 (HB0573)
Title
Fair Elections Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0519
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 (HB1019)
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0609 (HB1022)
Title
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0616
Title
Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0752 (HB0993)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0757 /CH0381
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Required Disclosures
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 /CH0204 (HB1231)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0903 (HB1145)
Title
State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0573 (SB0518) Fair Elections Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0892 (SB0329) Baltimore County - Civil Actions - Subpoena for Police Officer - Liability of Party for Reimbursement of Cost Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0985 Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0993 (SB0752) Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1019 (SB0532) Farmers' Rights Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1022 (SB0609) State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Establishment Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1101 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Program Integrity and Recovery Activities Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1145 (SB0903) State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0252 Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0329 (HB0892) Baltimore County - Civil Actions - Subpoena for Police Officer - Liability of Party for Reimbursement of Cost Senator Klausmeier 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0518 (HB0573) Fair Elections Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0519 Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0532 (HB1019) Farmers' Rights Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0609 (HB1022) State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot Program Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0616 Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local Licenses Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0752 (HB0993) Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0757 /CH0381 Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Required Disclosures Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0868 /CH0204 (HB1231) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Finance
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0903 (HB1145) State Board of Tree Experts - Establishment Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM