Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Subpoenas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 (SB0302)
Title
Accountability in Education Act of 2018
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0419 /CH0130
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General PG/MC 101-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0596 (SB0234/CH0470)
Title
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0981 /CH0834 (SB0875/CH0833)
Title
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 (SB0894)
Title
Metro Oversight Enhancement Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158 (SB1209)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1439 (SB0870)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Office of the Attorney General - Subpoena Power
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1626
Title
Public Information Act - Motor Vehicle Administration - Warrant or Subpoena for Personal Information
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122
Title
Criminal Law – Comprehensive Crime Bill of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 /CH0470 (HB0596)
Title
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0302 (HB0355)
Title
Accountability in Education Act of 2018
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0870 (HB1439)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Office of the Attorney General – Subpoena Power
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0875 /CH0833 (HB0981/CH0834)
Title
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0894 (HB1089)
Title
Metro Oversight Enhancement Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0355 (SB0302) Accountability in Education Act of 2018 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0419 /CH0130 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General PG/MC 101-18 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0596 (SB0234/CH0470) Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0981 /CH0834 (SB0875/CH0833) Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834
Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1089 (SB0894) Metro Oversight Enhancement Act Delegate Barron 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1158 (SB1209) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1439 (SB0870) Criminal Procedure - Office of the Attorney General - Subpoena Power Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1626 Public Information Act - Motor Vehicle Administration - Warrant or Subpoena for Personal Information Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0122 Criminal Law – Comprehensive Crime Bill of 2018 Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0234 /CH0470 (HB0596) Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0302 (HB0355) Accountability in Education Act of 2018 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2018 - 12:45 PM
SB0870 (HB1439) Criminal Procedure – Office of the Attorney General – Subpoena Power President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0875 /CH0833 (HB0981/CH0834) Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 833
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0894 (HB1089) Metro Oversight Enhancement Act Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:56 PM