Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Subpoenas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045 (SB0092)
Title
Accountability in Education Act of 2019
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050 /CH0131
Title
Department of Agriculture - Maryland Produce Safety Program
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0194
Title
Prince George's County Public Schools - Office of Accountability and Compliance - Establishment PG 508-19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0466 /CH0364 (SB0342)
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0625 /CH0460 (SB0847/CH0459)
Title
Baltimore Police Department – Commission to Restore Trust in Policing – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0648 /CH0374 (SB0652)
Title
Interstate Physical Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847 (SB0498)
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Disclosure of Data - Managed Care Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0867 (SB0013)
Title
Juveniles - Reportable Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1025 /CH0711 (SB0123/CH0712)
Title
Election Law - Coordinated Expenditures and Donations - Investigation
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1371
Title
Baltimore City - Public Safety Community Oversight Board
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0013 (HB0867)
Title
Juveniles - Reportable Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0092 (HB0045)
Title
Accountability in Education Act of 2019
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0123 /CH0712 (HB1025/CH0711)
Title
Election Law - Coordinated Expenditures and Donations - Investigation
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0342 (HB0466/CH0364)
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0498 (HB0847)
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Disclosure of Data - Managed Care Organizations
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652 (HB0648/CH0374)
Title
Interstate Physical Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843
Title
Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0847 /CH0459 (HB0625/CH0460)
Title
Baltimore Police Department – Commission to Restore Trust in Policing – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413)
Title
The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 (SB0092) Accountability in Education Act of 2019 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0050 /CH0131 Department of Agriculture - Maryland Produce Safety Program Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0194 Prince George's County Public Schools - Office of Accountability and Compliance - Establishment PG 508-19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0466 /CH0364 (SB0342) Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Program Evaluation Delegate Kerr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0625 /CH0460 (SB0847/CH0459) Baltimore Police Department – Commission to Restore Trust in Policing – Alterations Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Judiciary
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0648 /CH0374 (SB0652) Interstate Physical Therapy Licensure Compact Delegate Bagnall 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0847 (SB0498) Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Disclosure of Data - Managed Care Organizations Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0867 (SB0013) Juveniles - Reportable Offenses Delegate Corderman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1025 /CH0711 (SB0123/CH0712) Election Law - Coordinated Expenditures and Donations - Investigation Delegate Mosby 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 711
Ways and Means
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1371 Baltimore City - Public Safety Community Oversight Board Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0013 (HB0867) Juveniles - Reportable Offenses Senator Serafini 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0092 (HB0045) Accountability in Education Act of 2019 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0123 /CH0712 (HB1025/CH0711) Election Law - Coordinated Expenditures and Donations - Investigation Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0342 (HB0466/CH0364) Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Program Evaluation Chair, Finance Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0414 Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0498 (HB0847) Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Disclosure of Data - Managed Care Organizations Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0652 (HB0648/CH0374) Interstate Physical Therapy Licensure Compact Senator Young 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0843 Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0847 /CH0459 (HB0625/CH0460) Baltimore Police Department – Commission to Restore Trust in Policing – Alterations Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413) The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 771
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2019 - 4:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM