Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Summonses -see also- Subpoenas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0309
Title
Courts - Discovery - Examination in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment
Sponsor
Delegate Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336 (SB0009)
Title
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Playing by Individual Under 21 Years of Age
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0968
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Commencement of Actions to Repossess
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220 /CH0409
Title
Invalidation and Destruction of Unexecuted Warrant, Summons, or Other Criminal Process - Failure to Appear Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1251
Title
Public Safety - Firearms - Firearms Sales Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1481 (SB0557/CH0287)
Title
Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory Process
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0009 (HB0336)
Title
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Playing by Individual Under 21 Years of Age
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0557 /CH0287 (HB1481)
Title
Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory Process
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891
Title
Courts - Service of Process - Driver of Motor Vehicle or Driver's Estate
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1069
Title
Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0309 Courts - Discovery - Examination in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment Delegate Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0336 (SB0009) Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Playing by Individual Under 21 Years of Age Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0968 Landlord and Tenant - Commencement of Actions to Repossess Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1220 /CH0409 Invalidation and Destruction of Unexecuted Warrant, Summons, or Other Criminal Process - Failure to Appear Designation Delegate Swain 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1251 Public Safety - Firearms - Firearms Sales Prohibition Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1481 (SB0557/CH0287) Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory Process Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0009 (HB0336) Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Playing by Individual Under 21 Years of Age Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
SB0307 Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2013 Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0557 /CH0287 (HB1481) Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory Process Senator Stone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0891 Courts - Service of Process - Driver of Motor Vehicle or Driver's Estate Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1069 Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial Release Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM