Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Summonses -see also- Subpoenas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0226 (SB0049/CH0266)
Title
Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 (SB0481/CH0173)
Title
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Individual Under the Age of 21 Years
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370
Title
Uniform Act to Secure the Attendance of Witnesses From Without the State in Criminal Proceedings - News Media Privilege
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0390 (SB0057/CH0121)
Title
Office of the State's Attorney - Dorchester County - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1077
Title
Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Service of Process
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232 (SB0973)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Task Force on Pretrial Risk Assessment - Detainee Electronic Information Sharing System
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1273 (SB0986)
Title
Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0049 /CH0266 (HB0226)
Title
Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 /CH0121 (HB0390)
Title
Office of the State's Attorney - Dorchester County - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0260
Title
Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0364 /CH0158
Title
Criminal Law - Possession of Marijuana - Civil Offense
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0481 /CH0173 (HB0275)
Title
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Individual Under the Age of 21 Years
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0920
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0986 (HB1273)
Title
Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors Prohibited
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0226 (SB0049/CH0266) Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014 Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0275 (SB0481/CH0173) Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Individual Under the Age of 21 Years Delegate Reznik 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB0370 Uniform Act to Secure the Attendance of Witnesses From Without the State in Criminal Proceedings - News Media Privilege Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0390 (SB0057/CH0121) Office of the State's Attorney - Dorchester County - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1077 Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Service of Process Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1186 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2014 - 3:30 PM
HB1232 (SB0973) Criminal Procedure - Task Force on Pretrial Risk Assessment - Detainee Electronic Information Sharing System Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1273 (SB0986) Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors Prohibited Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0049 /CH0266 (HB0226) Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014 Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Economic Matters
SB0057 /CH0121 (HB0390) Office of the State's Attorney - Dorchester County - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2014 - 1:30 PM
Environmental Matters
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0260 Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial Release Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0364 /CH0158 Criminal Law - Possession of Marijuana - Civil Offense Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0481 /CH0173 (HB0275) Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Individual Under the Age of 21 Years Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0920 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0986 (HB1273) Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors Prohibited Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM