Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Summonses -see also- Subpoenas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008
Title
Uniform Act to Secure the Attendance of Witnesses From Without the State in Criminal Proceedings - News Media Privilege
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0105
Title
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia and Marijuana - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0494
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0495
Title
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia Possession of Less Than 10 Grams of Marijuana - Code Violation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1129 (SB0837)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1130
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0790
Title
Vehicle Laws - Right-of-Way Violations - Death or Serious Bodily Injury - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837 (HB1129)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 Uniform Act to Secure the Attendance of Witnesses From Without the State in Criminal Proceedings - News Media Privilege Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0105 Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia and Marijuana - Penalties Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-3)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0494 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0495 Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia Possession of Less Than 10 Grams of Marijuana - Code Violation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1129 (SB0837) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1130 Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - Penalties Delegate Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0790 Vehicle Laws - Right-of-Way Violations - Death or Serious Bodily Injury - Penalties Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0837 (HB1129) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM