Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Summonses -see also- Subpoenas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0832 (SB0520)
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023 /CH0783 (SB0861)
Title
Juvenile Law – Witnesses – Body Attachment
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0520 (HB0832)
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB1023/CH0783)
Title
Juvenile Law - Witnesses - Body Attachment
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0832 (SB0520) Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1023 /CH0783 (SB0861) Juvenile Law – Witnesses – Body Attachment Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 783
Judiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0520 (HB0832) Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0861 (HB1023/CH0783) Juvenile Law - Witnesses - Body Attachment Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:56 PM
Click to return on the top page