Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Summonses -see also- Subpoenas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0075
Title
Clerks of the Courts - Case Management System - Information on Judge or Magistrate
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0501 (SB0365)
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0573 (SB0138)
Title
Harford County - Service of Process - Detention Center Employees
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0784 (SB0957)
Title
Consumer Protection - Online Privacy - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0923 (SB0385)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1656
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Privacy and Data Collection
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0138 (HB0573)
Title
Harford County - Service of Process - Detention Center Employees
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0365 (HB0501)
Title
Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0957 (HB0784)
Title
Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1075
Title
Adult-Use Cannabis - Legalization
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0075 Clerks of the Courts - Case Management System - Information on Judge or Magistrate Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/22/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0501 (SB0365) Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0573 (SB0138) Harford County - Service of Process - Detention Center Employees Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0784 (SB0957) Consumer Protection - Online Privacy - Study Delegate Carey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
3/09/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0923 (SB0385) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MT (Movie Theater) License Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1400 Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1656 Commercial Law - Consumer Privacy and Data Collection Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0138 (HB0573) Harford County - Service of Process - Detention Center Employees Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2020 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0365 (HB0501) Criminal Law - Child Pornography and Exhibition and Display of Obscene Items to Minors Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0957 (HB0784) Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1075 Adult-Use Cannabis - Legalization Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 5:07 PM