Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Support of Dependents -see also- Alimony

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0505
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting and Fishing License Applications - Social Security Number
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0514
Title
Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of Information
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0541 (SB0571)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Completion
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0662
Title
Video Lottery Operation Licensees - Information on Payouts
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0715 (SB0620)
Title
Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 (SB0505/CH0487)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Cash Bail
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0792 /CH0059 (SB0507/CH0058)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child Support
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0849 (SB0579)
Title
Child Support - Adjusted Actual Income - Multifamily Adjustment
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1099 (SB0792)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1518
Title
Pension and Retirement Health Benefits - Child Support Enforcement Administration Employees - Transferees from Baltimore City State's Attorney's Office
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071
Title
Child Support Enforcement - Attachment and Seizure of Retirement Accounts and Claims Against Retirement Plans
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178
Title
Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of Paternity
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0181
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Presumptive Support Obligation
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0505 /CH0487 (HB0777)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Cash Bail
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0507 /CH0058 (HB0792/CH0059)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child Support
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 (HB0541)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Rehabilitation
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0579 (HB0849)
Title
Child Support - Adjusted Actual Income - Multifamily Adjustment
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0620 (HB0715)
Title
Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and Visitation
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0650
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting License Applications - Social Security Number
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 (HB1099)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0505 Natural Resources - Hunting and Fishing License Applications - Social Security Number Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0514 Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of Information Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0541 (SB0571) Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Completion Delegate Hough 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0662 Video Lottery Operation Licensees - Information on Payouts Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0715 (SB0620) Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and Visitation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0777 (SB0505/CH0487) Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Cash Bail Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0792 /CH0059 (SB0507/CH0058) Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child Support Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0849 (SB0579) Child Support - Adjusted Actual Income - Multifamily Adjustment Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1099 (SB0792) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1518 Pension and Retirement Health Benefits - Child Support Enforcement Administration Employees - Transferees from Baltimore City State's Attorney's Office Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0071 Child Support Enforcement - Attachment and Seizure of Retirement Accounts and Claims Against Retirement Plans Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/10/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0178 Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of Paternity Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0181 Family Law - Child Support - Presumptive Support Obligation Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0505 /CH0487 (HB0777) Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Cash Bail Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0507 /CH0058 (HB0792/CH0059) Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child Support Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0571 (HB0541) Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Rehabilitation Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0579 (HB0849) Child Support - Adjusted Actual Income - Multifamily Adjustment Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0620 (HB0715) Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and Visitation Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0650 Natural Resources - Hunting License Applications - Social Security Number Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0792 (HB1099) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM