Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Support of Dependents -see also- Alimony

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236 (SB0208)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0550 (SB0812)
Title
Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to Obligee
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0675
Title
Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of Information
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760
Title
Family Law - Out-of-State Civil Unions - Applicability of Domestic Relations Laws
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0769
Title
Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of Information
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805 /CH0553 (SB0763/CH0552)
Title
Talbot County - Child Support Enforcement - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816 (SB0261)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0907 /CH0622
Title
Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Intercepts for Child Support Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0958 (SB0411)
Title
Rape Survivor Family Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1174 /CH0448
Title
Recreational Hunting or Fishing Licenses - Denial, Suspension, and Required Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1301
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation Determinations
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208 (HB0236)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Modification
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0261 (HB0816)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0363
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce - Settlement Agreement
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0411 (HB0958)
Title
Rape Survivor Family Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 /CH0552 (HB0805/CH0553)
Title
Talbot County - Child Support Enforcement - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812 (HB0550)
Title
Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to Obligee
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1105
Title
Temporary Cash Assistance - Termination of Benefits and Case Closure - Timing
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0236 (SB0208) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0550 (SB0812) Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to Obligee Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0675 Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of Information Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0760 Family Law - Out-of-State Civil Unions - Applicability of Domestic Relations Laws Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0769 Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of Information Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0805 /CH0553 (SB0763/CH0552) Talbot County - Child Support Enforcement - Transfer of Personnel Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0816 (SB0261) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Delegate Hubbard 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0907 /CH0622 Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Intercepts for Child Support Payments Delegate Olszewski 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622
Ways and Means
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0958 (SB0411) Rape Survivor Family Protection Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1174 /CH0448 Recreational Hunting or Fishing Licenses - Denial, Suspension, and Required Disclosure Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Environmental Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1301 Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation Determinations Delegate Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0208 (HB0236) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0220 Family Law - Child Support - Modification Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0261 (HB0816) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0363 Family Law - Grounds for Divorce - Settlement Agreement Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0411 (HB0958) Rape Survivor Family Protection Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0763 /CH0552 (HB0805/CH0553) Talbot County - Child Support Enforcement - Transfer of Personnel Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Finance
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0812 (HB0550) Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to Obligee Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1105 Temporary Cash Assistance - Termination of Benefits and Case Closure - Timing Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM