Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Support of Dependents -see also- Alimony

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Minimum
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0163
Title
Child Support - Adjusted Actual Income - Multifamily Adjustment
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 (SB0268)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0220 (SB0273)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0503 (SB0078)
Title
Rape Survivor Family Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0924 (SB0272)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1083 (SB0550)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1192
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation Determinations
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289 /CH0308 (SB0941)
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0078 (HB0503)
Title
Rape Survivor Family Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268 (HB0210)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0272 (HB0924)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 (HB0220)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0472 /CH0353
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce - Mutual Consent
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0550 (HB1083)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556 /CH0363
Title
Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 (HB1289/CH0308)
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Minimum Delegate Schulz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0163 Child Support - Adjusted Actual Income - Multifamily Adjustment Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0210 (SB0268) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0220 (SB0273) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0503 (SB0078) Rape Survivor Family Protection Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0924 (SB0272) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1083 (SB0550) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1192 Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation Determinations Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1289 /CH0308 (SB0941) Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Judiciary
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0078 (HB0503) Rape Survivor Family Protection Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0268 (HB0210) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0272 (HB0924) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0273 (HB0220) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0472 /CH0353 Family Law - Grounds for Divorce - Mutual Consent Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0550 (HB1083) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0556 /CH0363 Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal Law Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0941 (HB1289/CH0308) Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM