Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Support of Dependents -see also- Alimony

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0103 /CH0205
Title
Department of Human Resources and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Renaming
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0428 (SB0574)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457 /CH0134 (SB0347/CH0135)
Title
Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0508
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0764 /CH0541 (SB0676/CH0540)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0844 (SB0799/CH0488)
Title
Driver Improvement Program and Failure to Pay Child Support - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of Points
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895 (SB0655)
Title
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0926 /CH0739
Title
Child Support - Health Insurance - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0955
Title
Family Law - Age of Majority - Jurisdiction of Court
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1047 (SB0906/CH0204)
Title
Child Support - Noncompliance With Court Order - License Suspension
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1247
Title
Family Law - Child Support Actions - Court Costs
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1248
Title
Child Support Guidelines - Presumption of Full-Time Work at Minimum Wage Rate
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1469 /CH0737 (SB1009/CH0738)
Title
Public Assistance - Family Investment Program - Child Support Pass Through
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0347 /CH0135 (HB0457/CH0134)
Title
Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0368
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0574 (HB0428)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0655 (HB0895)
Title
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0676 /CH0540 (HB0764/CH0541)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0799 /CH0488 (HB0844)
Title
Driver Improvement Program and Failure to Pay Child Support - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of Points
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0906 /CH0204 (HB1047)
Title
Child Support -Noncompliance With Court Order - License Suspension
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1009 /CH0738 (HB1469/CH0737)
Title
Public Assistance - Family Investment Program - Child Support Pass Through
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1095
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0103 /CH0205 Department of Human Resources and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Renaming Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0428 (SB0574) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0457 /CH0134 (SB0347/CH0135) Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0508 Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0764 /CH0541 (SB0676/CH0540) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0844 (SB0799/CH0488) Driver Improvement Program and Failure to Pay Child Support - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of Points Delegate Moon 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Judiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0895 (SB0655) Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0926 /CH0739 Child Support - Health Insurance - Definition Delegate McComas 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 739
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0955 Family Law - Age of Majority - Jurisdiction of Court Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1047 (SB0906/CH0204) Child Support - Noncompliance With Court Order - License Suspension Delegate Moon 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1247 Family Law - Child Support Actions - Court Costs Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1248 Child Support Guidelines - Presumption of Full-Time Work at Minimum Wage Rate Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1469 /CH0737 (SB1009/CH0738) Public Assistance - Family Investment Program - Child Support Pass Through Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 737
Appropriations
3/02/2017 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0347 /CH0135 (HB0457/CH0134) Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel Charles County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0368 Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0574 (HB0428) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0655 (HB0895) Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0676 /CH0540 (HB0764/CH0541) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0799 /CH0488 (HB0844) Driver Improvement Program and Failure to Pay Child Support - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of Points Senator Muse 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0906 /CH0204 (HB1047) Child Support -Noncompliance With Court Order - License Suspension Senator Muse 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1009 /CH0738 (HB1469/CH0737) Public Assistance - Family Investment Program - Child Support Pass Through Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 738
Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1095 Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM