Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Support of Dependents -see also- Alimony

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0036
Title
Juvenile Proceedings - Fines, Fees, and Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0148
Title
Family Law - Nonpayment of Child Support - Sentencing
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0191
Title
Child Support, Custody, and Visitation - Award of Expenses - Suit Money
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0231 (SB0530)
Title
Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0234
Title
Child Support - Suspension of Payments and Arrears for Incarcerated Obligors - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0269 (SB0579)
Title
Child Support - Shared Physical Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0367
Title
Child Support – Multifamily Adjustment
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 (SB0137)
Title
Harford County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0647
Title
Child Support - Reporting of Employment Information
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0658
Title
Local Correctional Facilities - Requirement for Prerelease Program
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0667
Title
Child Support - Annual Collection Fee
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839 (SB0539)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0946 (SB0847)
Title
Child Support - Guidelines
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1230
Title
State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retirees
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266
Title
Child Support - Modification - Credit Toward Arrearage
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1313 (SB0787)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1420 (SB0875)
Title
Hospitals - Financial Assistance Policies and Bill Collections
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137 (HB0407)
Title
Harford County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0183
Title
Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for Pregnancy
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530 (HB0231)
Title
Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0539 (HB0839)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0579 (HB0269)
Title
Child Support - Shared Physical Custody
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0665
Title
Family Law - Custody Evaluator - Information to Parties
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB1313)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0847 (HB0946)
Title
Child Support – Guidelines
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1006
Title
Child Support - Suspension of Payments and Arrears for Incarcerated Obligors - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0036 Juvenile Proceedings - Fines, Fees, and Costs Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0148 Family Law - Nonpayment of Child Support - Sentencing Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0191 Child Support, Custody, and Visitation - Award of Expenses - Suit Money Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/30/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0231 (SB0530) Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0234 Child Support - Suspension of Payments and Arrears for Incarcerated Obligors - Modifications Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/30/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0269 (SB0579) Child Support - Shared Physical Custody Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0367 Child Support – Multifamily Adjustment Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0407 (SB0137) Harford County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Administration - Transfer of Personnel Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0647 Child Support - Reporting of Employment Information Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0658 Local Correctional Facilities - Requirement for Prerelease Program Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0667 Child Support - Annual Collection Fee Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0839 (SB0539) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/24/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0946 (SB0847) Child Support - Guidelines Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 (SB1010) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1230 State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retirees Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1266 Child Support - Modification - Credit Toward Arrearage Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1313 (SB0787) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1420 (SB0875) Hospitals - Financial Assistance Policies and Bill Collections Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0137 (HB0407) Harford County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Administration - Transfer of Personnel Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0183 Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for Pregnancy Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0530 (HB0231) Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0539 (HB0839) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0579 (HB0269) Child Support - Shared Physical Custody Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0665 Family Law - Custody Evaluator - Information to Parties Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0787 (HB1313) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/06/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0847 (HB0946) Child Support – Guidelines Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1006 Child Support - Suspension of Payments and Arrears for Incarcerated Obligors - Modifications Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1010 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/18/2020 1:49 PM