Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Support of Dependents -see also- Alimony

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0343 (SB0394)
Title
Family Law - Nonpayment of Child Support - Sentencing
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0580 (SB0402)
Title
Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816
Title
Family Law - Support of Destitute Adult Children - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331 (SB0898)
Title
Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1339
Title
Child Support - Guidelines
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355
Title
Family Law – Custody Evaluators – Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0394 (HB0343)
Title
Family Law - Nonpayment of Child Support - Sentencing
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0402 (HB0580)
Title
Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898 (HB1331)
Title
Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0343 (SB0394) Family Law - Nonpayment of Child Support - Sentencing Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0580 (SB0402) Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Repeal Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0816 Family Law - Support of Destitute Adult Children - Repeal Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1331 (SB0898) Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021 Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1339 Child Support - Guidelines Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
3/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2021 - 1:45 PM
SB0355 Family Law – Custody Evaluators – Qualifications and Training Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0394 (HB0343) Family Law - Nonpayment of Child Support - Sentencing Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0402 (HB0580) Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Repeal Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0898 (HB1331) Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021 Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 8:06 PM
Click to return on the top page