Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Surveyors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0040 (SB0386)
Title
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0442 (SB0323)
Title
Mechanics' Liens - Design Services
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0455 (SB0387)
Title
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720 /CH0270
Title
Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0323 (HB0442)
Title
Mechanics' Liens - Design Services
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 (HB0040)
Title
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387 (HB0455)
Title
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0040 (SB0386) Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0442 (SB0323) Mechanics' Liens - Design Services Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0455 (SB0387) Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0720 /CH0270 Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm Permits Delegate Vaughn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0323 (HB0442) Mechanics' Liens - Design Services Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0386 (HB0040) Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0387 (HB0455) Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM