Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Surveyors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306 /CH0319
Title
Labor and Employment - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans and Their Spouses
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0871 /CH0636 (SB0234)
Title
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428 (SB0748)
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act - Application
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1457 /CH0139
Title
Land Surveyors - Qualifications for License - Education, Experience, and Examination Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 (HB0871/CH0636)
Title
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0245 /CH0318
Title
Labor and Employment - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans and Their Spouses
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0748 (HB1428)
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act - Application
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0306 /CH0319 Labor and Employment - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans and Their Spouses Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Economic Matters
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0871 /CH0636 (SB0234) Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void Delegate Parrott 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1428 (SB0748) Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act - Application Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1457 /CH0139 Land Surveyors - Qualifications for License - Education, Experience, and Examination Requirements Delegate Vaughn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Economic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0234 (HB0871/CH0636) Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void Senator Hough 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0245 /CH0318 Labor and Employment - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans and Their Spouses Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Finance
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0748 (HB1428) Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act - Application Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM