Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Surveyors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0681 (SB0368)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858 /CH0347 (SB0249/CH0348)
Title
Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1479 /CH0480
Title
Calvert County - Subdivision Plats - Stormwater Management Easements
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0249 /CH0348 (HB0858/CH0347)
Title
Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0368 (HB0681)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0681 (SB0368) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0858 /CH0347 (SB0249/CH0348) Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order Delegate McComas 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 347
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1385 Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1479 /CH0480 Calvert County - Subdivision Plats - Stormwater Management Easements Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0249 /CH0348 (HB0858/CH0347) Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order Senator Cassilly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 348
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0368 (HB0681) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 1:59 PM