Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Swimming Pools

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0364 /CH0107
Title
Swimming Pools - Automated External Defibrillator Programs (Connor's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1351
Title
Health - Smoking - Public Playgrounds and Swimming Pools - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0364 /CH0107 Swimming Pools - Automated External Defibrillator Programs (Connor's Law) Delegate Hucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1351 Health - Smoking - Public Playgrounds and Swimming Pools - Prohibition Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM