Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Swimming Pools

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 /CH0262 (SB0331)
Title
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1248
Title
Swimming Pools - Automated External Defibrillator Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1335
Title
Health - Smoking - Public Playgrounds and Swimming Pools - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0187 Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0295 /CH0262 (SB0331) Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1248 Swimming Pools - Automated External Defibrillator Programs Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1335 Health - Smoking - Public Playgrounds and Swimming Pools - Prohibition Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM