Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Swimming Pools

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0302 (SB0025)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Woods Community Center
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0767 (SB0714)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - YMCA of Cecil County Outdoor Pool
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0923 (SB0685)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Rockville Swim and Fitness Center
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0938
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Hillcrest Heights Community Center Pool
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1101 /CH0131
Title
Municipal Corporations - Closed Swimming Lake - Regulation MC 32-16
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0025 (HB0302)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Woods Community Center
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0685 (HB0923)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Rockville Swim and Fitness Center
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0714 (HB0767)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - YMCA of Cecil County Outdoor Pool
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0302 (SB0025) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Woods Community Center Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0767 (SB0714) Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - YMCA of Cecil County Outdoor Pool Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0777 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0923 (SB0685) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Rockville Swim and Fitness Center Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 10:00 AM
HB0938 Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Hillcrest Heights Community Center Pool Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB1101 /CH0131 Municipal Corporations - Closed Swimming Lake - Regulation MC 32-16 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0025 (HB0302) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Woods Community Center Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 12:00 PM
SB0685 (HB0923) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Rockville Swim and Fitness Center Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 12:00 PM
SB0714 (HB0767) Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - YMCA of Cecil County Outdoor Pool Cecil County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM