Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Talbot County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0042 (SB0020)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Easton Head Start Center
Sponsor
Delegate Cane
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0290 (SB0147)
Title
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847 (SB0882)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Oxford Community Center
Sponsor
Delegate Cane
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0020 (HB0042)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Easton Head Start Center
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0147 (HB0290)
Title
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789
Title
Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0882 (HB0847)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Oxford Community Center
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0042 (SB0020) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Easton Head Start Center Delegate Cane 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 3:00 PM
HB0290 (SB0147) Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement Caroline County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0847 (SB0882) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Oxford Community Center Delegate Cane 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 3:00 PM
SB0020 (HB0042) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Easton Head Start Center Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0147 (HB0290) Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement Senator Colburn 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0789 Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0882 (HB0847) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Oxford Community Center Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM