Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Talbot County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0369 (SB0383/CH0166)
Title
Public Safety - Appointment of Members of Fire Companies as Deputy Sheriffs - Caroline County and Talbot County
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0841 (SB0855)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Eastern Shore Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 (SB0196)
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1149 (SB0731)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Maritime Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1250 (SB0858)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Job Training Center
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196 (HB1089)
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0383 /CH0166 (HB0369)
Title
Public Safety - Appointment of Members of Fire Companies as Deputy Sheriffs - Caroline County and Talbot County
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0731 (HB1149)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Maritime Museum
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0855 (HB0841)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Eastern Shore Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0858 (HB1250)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Job Training Center
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0369 (SB0383/CH0166) Public Safety - Appointment of Members of Fire Companies as Deputy Sheriffs - Caroline County and Talbot County Caroline County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0638 Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0841 (SB0855) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Eastern Shore Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1089 (SB0196) Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1149 (SB0731) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Maritime Museum Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 3:00 PM
HB1250 (SB0858) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Job Training Center Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 3:00 PM
SB0196 (HB1089) Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0383 /CH0166 (HB0369) Public Safety - Appointment of Members of Fire Companies as Deputy Sheriffs - Caroline County and Talbot County Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0731 (HB1149) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Maritime Museum Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0855 (HB0841) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Eastern Shore Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0858 (HB1250) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Job Training Center Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM