Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Talbot County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0206 (SB0140)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Maritime Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0208 (SB0139)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Jobs Training Center
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0226 /CH0150 (SB0016/CH0149)
Title
Talbot County - Board of Education - Student Members
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0526 (SB0747)
Title
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 (SB0729)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Eastern Shore Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1169 (SB0963)
Title
Harris Creek Oyster Restoration - Vessel Damage - Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350 (SB0707/CH0420)
Title
Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1596 (SB1113)
Title
Talbot County - Deer Management Permit - Firearms
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0016 /CH0149 (HB0226/CH0150)
Title
Talbot County - Board of Education - Student Members
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0139 (HB0208)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Jobs Training Center
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0140 (HB0206)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Maritime Museum
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0707 /CH0420 (HB1350)
Title
Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0728 (HB1143)
Title
Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler Systems
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0729 (HB1097)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0747 (HB0526)
Title
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0963 (HB1169)
Title
Harris Creek Oyster Restoration - Vessel Damage - Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1061
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1113 (HB1596)
Title
Talbot County - Deer Management Permit - Firearms
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0206 (SB0140) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Maritime Museum Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0208 (SB0139) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Jobs Training Center Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0226 /CH0150 (SB0016/CH0149) Talbot County - Board of Education - Student Members Delegate Mautz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0526 (SB0747) Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1097 (SB0729) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Eastern Shore Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1169 (SB0963) Harris Creek Oyster Restoration - Vessel Damage - Compensation Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1350 (SB0707/CH0420) Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition Delegate Hammen 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1596 (SB1113) Talbot County - Deer Management Permit - Firearms Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0016 /CH0149 (HB0226/CH0150) Talbot County - Board of Education - Student Members Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2016 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0139 (HB0208) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Jobs Training Center Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 AM
SB0140 (HB0206) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Maritime Museum Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 AM
SB0707 /CH0420 (HB1350) Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0728 (HB1143) Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler Systems Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 AM
SB0729 (HB1097) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0737 Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 PM
SB0747 (HB0526) Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 PM
SB0963 (HB1169) Harris Creek Oyster Restoration - Vessel Damage - Compensation Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1061 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide Authorization Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules
Rules
SB1113 (HB1596) Talbot County - Deer Management Permit - Firearms Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM