Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Talbot County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173 /CH0095
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 (SB0794/CH0583)
Title
County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1129 (SB0500)
Title
Talbot County - Turkey and Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1130 (SB0312)
Title
Talbot County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1132
Title
Talbot County – Speed Monitoring Systems – Intersection of Maryland Route 333 (Oxford Road) and Bonfield Avenue
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 (SB1000)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1544
Title
Public Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Council Members and County Executives - Limitations on Applicant Contributions
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0312 (HB1130)
Title
Talbot County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0500 (HB1129)
Title
Talbot County - Turkey and Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0794 /CH0583 (HB0603)
Title
County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000 (HB1300)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1081 /CH0595
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0173 /CH0095 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 95
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0603 (SB0794/CH0583) County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1129 (SB0500) Talbot County - Turkey and Deer Hunting - Sundays Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1130 (SB0312) Talbot County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1132 Talbot County – Speed Monitoring Systems – Intersection of Maryland Route 333 (Oxford Road) and Bonfield Avenue Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1300 (SB1000) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1353 Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1544 Public Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Council Members and County Executives - Limitations on Applicant Contributions Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0312 (HB1130) Talbot County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0500 (HB1129) Talbot County - Turkey and Deer Hunting - Sundays Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0794 /CH0583 (HB0603) County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority Senator Hershey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB1000 (HB1300) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1081 /CH0595 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:17 PM