Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxicabs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0003 /CH0028 (SB0054/CH0016)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation - Clarifications
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0884 /CH0283 (SB1001)
Title
St. Mary's County - Taxicabs - Repeal of Local Provisions
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1439
Title
Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054 /CH0016 (HB0003/CH0028)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation - Clarifications
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1001 (HB0884/CH0283)
Title
St. Mary's County - Taxicabs - Repeal of Local Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0003 /CH0028 (SB0054/CH0016) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation - Clarifications Delegate Davis 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28
Economic Matters
1/21/2016 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0884 /CH0283 (SB1001) St. Mary's County - Taxicabs - Repeal of Local Provisions St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Economic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1439 Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0054 /CH0016 (HB0003/CH0028) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation - Clarifications Senator Middleton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16
Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1001 (HB0884/CH0283) St. Mary's County - Taxicabs - Repeal of Local Provisions Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM