Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Tax Returns

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Combined Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0647
Title
Child Support - Reporting of Employment Information
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732
Title
Taxation – Tobacco Tax, Sales and Use Tax, and Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices, Other Tobacco Products, and Cigarettes - Taxation and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0104
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0621
Title
Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Considerations of a Mortgage Servicer - Borrower's Ability to Repay
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0628 /CH0570
Title
Utilities - Surviving Spouse of Account Holder - Protections
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0644
Title
Income Tax Checkoff - The Blueprint for Maryland's Future Fund
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0295 Corporate Income Tax - Combined Reporting Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0647 Child Support - Reporting of Employment Information Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0732 Taxation – Tobacco Tax, Sales and Use Tax, and Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Budget and Taxation
SB0003 Electronic Smoking Devices, Other Tobacco Products, and Cigarettes - Taxation and Regulation Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0104 Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - Requirements Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
1/30/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0621 Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Considerations of a Mortgage Servicer - Borrower's Ability to Repay Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0628 /CH0570 Utilities - Surviving Spouse of Account Holder - Protections Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 570
Finance
2/21/2020 - 12:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0644 Income Tax Checkoff - The Blueprint for Maryland's Future Fund Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:25 PM