Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Tax Sales

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0180 /CH0126 (SB0076/CH0125)
Title
Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0446 /CH0599
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Attorney's Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0933 (SB0179)
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax - Notice of Tax Bill Address Change - Prohibition of Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1530 /CH0254
Title
St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission - Unpaid Charges
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076 /CH0125 (HB0180/CH0126)
Title
Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 /CH0471
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Nonpayment of Environmental Citations
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0179 (HB0933)
Title
Property Tax - Notice of Tax Bill Address Change - Prohibition of Sale
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0903
Title
Tax Sales - Stormwater Remediation Fees - Temporary Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0180 /CH0126 (SB0076/CH0125) Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0446 /CH0599 Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Attorney's Fees Delegate Stukes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599
Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB0933 (SB0179) Baltimore City - Property Tax - Notice of Tax Bill Address Change - Prohibition of Sale Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0940 Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1530 /CH0254 St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission - Unpaid Charges St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0076 /CH0125 (HB0180/CH0126) Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0141 /CH0471 Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Nonpayment of Environmental Citations Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0179 (HB0933) Property Tax - Notice of Tax Bill Address Change - Prohibition of Sale Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
SB0903 Tax Sales - Stormwater Remediation Fees - Temporary Prohibition Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM