Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Tax Sales

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0475
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Accrual of Property Tax, Interest, and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1112 (SB0951/CH0568)
Title
Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246 (SB0954)
Title
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409
Title
Baltimore City – Tax Sales of Real Property – Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1465 /CH0058
Title
Tax Sales - Homeowner Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0942
Title
Property Tax - Electronic Notification of Tax Sales
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0951 /CH0568 (HB1112)
Title
Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0952 /CH0059
Title
Tax Sales – Homeowner Protections
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0954 (HB1246)
Title
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1098 /CH0714
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water Liens
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0475 Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Accrual of Property Tax, Interest, and Penalties Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1112 (SB0951/CH0568) Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1246 (SB0954) Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1409 Baltimore City – Tax Sales of Real Property – Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act) Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1465 /CH0058 Tax Sales - Homeowner Protections Delegate Walker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0942 Property Tax - Electronic Notification of Tax Sales Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0951 /CH0568 (HB1112) Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 568
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0952 /CH0059 Tax Sales – Homeowner Protections Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0954 (HB1246) Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1098 /CH0714 Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water Liens Senator Robinson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 714
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:57 PM